Glasner v. American Economy Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley, Pamela Seeley, Malina Ali and Arij Ali
Defendant: American Economy Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Case Number: 1:2021cv11047
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added T. Joseph Snodgrass. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of T. Joseph Snodgrass Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8891093 by Arij Ali, Malina Ali, Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley, Pamela Seeley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of T. Joseph Snodgrass)(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Malina Ali, Pamela Seeley, Arij Ali, Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley. Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Peterson, Erik)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Malina Ali, Pamela Seeley, Arij Ali, Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley. American Economy Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Peterson, Erik)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Malina Ali, Pamela Seeley, Arij Ali, Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Peterson, Erik)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Erik D. Peterson; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Brandon McWherter. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of J. Brandon McWherter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8883206 by Arij Ali, Malina Ali, Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley, Pamela Seeley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erik D. Peterson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8883194 by Arij Ali, Malina Ali, Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley, Pamela Seeley. (Attachments: #1 A)(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Glasner, Dwight Seeley, Pamela Seeley, Malina Ali, Arij Ali.(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Economy Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Economy Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8834052 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeffrey Glasner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Feigenbaum, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasner v. American Economy Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Economy Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Glasner
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Seeley
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Seeley
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malina Ali
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arij Ali
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: T Joseph Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?