Killebrew v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Olivia Killebrew
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv11073
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: 60 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered, see order attached for further details. (Molloy, Maryellen)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement Joint by Boston Scientific Corporation (White, Lisa)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response due by 9/2/2021. (PBS, law6)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan D. Murphy on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Murphy, Susan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/02/2021 to File Response/Reply by Boston Scientific Corporation.(White, Lisa)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Oliver White on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (White, Lisa)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Olivia Killebrew. All Defendants. Acknowledgment filed by Olivia Killebrew. (Ferraro, Julie)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Danae N. Benton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Danae Benton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8845885 by Olivia Killebrew. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ferraro, Julie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/7/2021) (Lara, Miguel).
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8838241 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Olivia Killebrew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Ferraro, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2021: #3 Exhibit A) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/29/2021) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killebrew v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Killebrew
Represented By: Julie S. Ferraro
Represented By: Danae N. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Oliver White
Represented By: Susan D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?