National Immigration Litigation Alliance et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Plaintiff: Haitian Bridge Alliance, National Immigration Alliance, Al Otro Lado and National Immigration Litigation Alliance
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2021cv11094
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered setting pretrial schedule.U.S. Customs and Border Protection having filed an Answer, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 9/10/21; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties must be filed by 10/15/21. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be served within the 30 days of initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. All fact discovery must be completed no later than 2/25/22. Dispositive Motions are due by 3/21/22, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 4/11/22; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 12/30/21, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection.(Fitzgerald, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Service of Process filed by Al Otro Lado, Haitian Bridge Alliance, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. Individual(s)/Entities served: U.S. Department of Justice for U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Roberts, John)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Process filed by Al Otro Lado, Haitian Bridge Alliance, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. Individual(s)/Entities served: U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Washington, DC. (Roberts, John)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fitzgerald on behalf of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (Fitzgerald, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Haitian Bridge Alliance, Al Otro Lado, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. (Roberts, John)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Trina Realmuto, Kristin Macleod-Ball, Nicole Elizabeth Ramos, Nicole Phillips. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Trina Realmuto, Kristin Macleod-Ball, Nicole Elizabeth Ramos, Nicole Phillips Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8857691 by Al Otro Lado, Haitian Bridge Alliance, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Trina Realmuto, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Kristin Macleod-Ball, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Nicole Elizabeth Ramos, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Nicole Phillips, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, John)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael T. Mervis, Julia D. Alonzo, and David M. Hanna. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael T. Mervis, Julia D. Alonzo, David M. Hanna Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8857684 by Al Otro Lado, Haitian Bridge Alliance, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael T. Mervis, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Julia D. Alonzo, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of David M. Hanna, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Customs and Border Protection Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8843992 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Al Otro Lado, Haitian Bridge Alliance, National Immigration Litigation Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Roberts, John) Modified on 7/2/2021: Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Immigration Litigation Alliance et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haitian Bridge Alliance
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: David Hanna
Represented By: Julia Alonzo
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Nicole Phillips
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Ramos
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Immigration Alliance
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: David Hanna
Represented By: Julia Alonzo
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Nicole Phillips
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Ramos
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Immigration Litigation Alliance
Represented By: David Hanna
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Julia Alonzo
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball
Represented By: Michael T. Mervis
Represented By: Nicole Phillips
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Ramos
Represented By: Trina Realmuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Michael Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?