BONAVITO v. HARVARD UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: ROBERT BONAVITO and ROBERT A. BONAVITO
Defendant: Harvard University
Case Number: 1:2021cv11110
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 39 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR CLOSURE(Paine, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 38 Judge William G. Young ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #35 Motion to Stay (Paine, Matthew)This case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened upon motion of either party upon conclusion of the proceedings in the Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit.
August 12, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION to Stay filed by Harvard University. (Fick, William)
August 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. BONAVITO (BONAVITO, ROBERT)
July 30, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay by ROBERT A. BONAVITO.(BONAVITO, ROBERT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 35 replaced on 8/5/2021) (Paine, Matthew).
July 26, 2021 Filing 34 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Assented to Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading is due on or before August 14, 2021.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.( Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2021 03:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young.); granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 11, 2021 Filing 33 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference, Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other responsive pleading ( Responses due by 7/26/2021) by Harvard University.(Fick, William)
July 9, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 8, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel N. Marx on behalf of Harvard University (Marx, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Fick on behalf of Harvard University (Fick, William)
July 6, 2021 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
July 6, 2021 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:20-cv-14657.
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss and Granting Defendant's #7 Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/30/2021. (jmh)
June 30, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/30/2021. (jmh)
June 30, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmh)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #17 Motion to Seal. The filing at ECF No. #12 -3 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/28/2021. (jmh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 Letter requesting to schedule a Case Management Conference from Robert A. Bonavito. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of Plaintiff's #17 Motion Seal Confidential Records and Leave to Amend Complaint filed by ROBERT BONAVITO (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jmh)(Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER Plaintiff's letter request #21 is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to file his Reply brief re: #17 MOTION to Seal Confidential Records and Leave to Amend Complaint is extended to February 22, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/4/2021. (JB)
February 4, 2021 Filing 21 Letter requesting extension from Robert A. Bonavito. (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 2, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition filed by HARVARD UNIVERSITY re #17 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Amend/Correct to Join Connell Foley LLP and John Doe as Defendants to the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SMALL, BRYAN)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER granting the request #18 that the #17 MOTION to Seal Confidential Records and Leave to Amend Complaint be adjourned until 2/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/15/2021. (jem)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #17 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Amend/Correct . (SMALL, BRYAN)
January 15, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #19 7.1 Letter for an automatic extension filed by Bryan Small on 1/15/2021 is beyond the scope of what the clerk can grant. The #17 Motion to Seal and Amend/Correct Answer is not a Dispositive Motion. This request has been forwarded to chambers. (jmh)
January 15, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Seal Confidential Records and Leave to Amend Complaint. Motion reset for 2/16/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
January 4, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Confidential Records and Leave to Amend Complaint by ROBERT BONAVITO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Amended Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service)(jem)
January 4, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Seal Confidential Records and Leave to Amend Complaint. Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEMPORARY ORDER TO SEAL: the Clerk of the Court is to place the filing #12 -3 under temporary seal; Plaintiff is to file a motion to seal within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/23/2020. (jem)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Jonathan P. McHenry. (SMALL, BRYAN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 Letter to Judge Douglas E. Arpert from ROBERT BONAVITO requesting confidential information be removed from the docket. (jem)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 SUR-REPLY filed by ROBERT BONAVITO in Response to Defendants #12 Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jem)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support filed by HARVARD UNIVERSITY re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venue, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion #7 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Bradley E. Abruzzi, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kimberly A. Parke, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-H to Parke Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service)(SMALL, BRYAN)
December 2, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venue. Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 2 week extention of return date of the motion. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/30/2020. (mg)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to Judge Michael A. Shipp from Robert Bonavito requesting clarification of a letter #9 received from the Defendant dated 11/24/2020. (jem)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Jonathan P. McHenry. (SMALL, BRYAN)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion #7 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3), or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by ROBERT BONAVITO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(jem)
November 23, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion #7 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3), or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venue by HARVARD UNIVERSITY. Responses due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration Declaration of Bradley E. Abruzzi, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SMALL, BRYAN)
November 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or In The Alternative To Transfer Venue. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to Judge Douglas E. Arpert from ROBERT BONAVITO requesting update on discovery request and status of Defendant's Answer. (jem)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by ROBERT BONAVITO. (jem)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to President and Fellows of Harvard College.. (SMALL, BRYAN)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN P. MCHENRY on behalf of HARVARD UNIVERSITY (MCHENRY, JONATHAN)
October 26, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HARVARD UNIVERSITY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/9/2020. (jmh)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN ANTHONY SMALL on behalf of HARVARD UNIVERSITY (SMALL, BRYAN)
October 23, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan Small appears to have the incorrect document attached. Please review this filing, and refile the correct document. (jmh)
October 20, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 20, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by President and Fellows of Harvard College from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Hunterdon CountyOcean, case number HNT-L-000320-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11524306), filed by President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(SMALL, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONAVITO v. HARVARD UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BONAVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. BONAVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard University
Represented By: JONATHAN P. MCHENRY
Represented By: BRYAN ANTHONY SMALL
Represented By: William W. Fick
Represented By: Daniel N. Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?