Ally Financial Inc. v. The City of New Bedford et al
Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.
Defendant: The City of New Bedford and South Coast Towing Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11115
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 25 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #23 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint As a Matter of Course by Ally Financial Inc. ALLOWED. Counsel is reminded that ordinarily a motion must include a certificate of conferral pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(2). (Dore, Samantha)
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ally Financial Inc.. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Amended Complaint)(Lushan, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint As a Matter of Course by Ally Financial Inc..(Lushan, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The City of New Bedford.(Davis, Katie)
August 6, 2021 Filing 21 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Allowed. Answer due 9/3/2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 5, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by South Coast Towing Inc.. (Gushue, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/3/2021 to File Answer by South Coast Towing Inc..(Gushue, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Gushue on behalf of South Coast Towing Inc. (Gushue, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/3/2021 to File Answer by South Coast Towing Inc..(Gushue, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Case General Procedures ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 25, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Allowed. Answer due by August 25, 2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 25, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by The City of New Bedford.(Cloherty, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Cloherty, III on behalf of The City of New Bedford (Cloherty, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket entries 8 & 9 re-docketed under the proper CM/ECF events in order to set answer deadlines. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. South Coast Towing Inc. served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. The City of New Bedford served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Service of Process filed by Ally Financial Inc.. Individual(s)/Entities served: South Coast Towing Inc.. (Lushan, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Service of Process filed by Ally Financial Inc.. Individual(s)/Entities served: The City of New Bedford. (Lushan, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 10/5/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8847562 for #1 Complaint.(Burgos, Sandra)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge by Ally Financial Inc. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ally Financial Inc.. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ally Financial Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Local Category Form)(Burgos, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ally Financial Inc. v. The City of New Bedford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New Bedford
Represented By: Katie Cooper Davis
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Coast Towing Inc.
Represented By: John J. Gushue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?