Wedge Water LLC v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wedge Water, LLC doing business as Wave Soda
Defendant: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 1:2021cv11123
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Referring Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wedge Water, LLC (Toms, Keith)
July 23, 2021 Filing 48 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to 8/30/21 to File Response/Reply to Complaint. Response due by 8/30/2021. (Loret, Magdalena)
July 22, 2021 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/30/21 to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc..(Snyder, John)
July 9, 2021 Filing 46 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. answer due 7/30/2021. (Loret, Magdalena)
July 8, 2021 Filing 45 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/30/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc..(Snyder, John)
July 8, 2021 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
July 8, 2021 Filing 43 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Case assigned on a random draw in error. See dkt. no. #39 . Case to be directly assigned to Judge Mark L. Wolf and Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler as the action is related to 1:21-cv-10669-MLW. (Danieli, Chris)
July 7, 2021 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
July 7, 2021 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00809.
July 1, 2021 Filing 40 Case transferred to District of Massachusetts. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Massachusetts*.. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/1/21. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (dlg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/25/2021. (zda)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to July 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/23/21. (dlg)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Protective Order With Modification #31 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/23/21.(dlg)
June 22, 2021 Filing 35 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by 21 Days by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
June 21, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE Pertinent to Pending Motion to Stay by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Marci) (dlg).
June 18, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wedge Water LLC, as to Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Levine, Andrew)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 *** WITHDRAWN PER MJ CHAMBERS *** ORDER Granting Joint #31 Motion for Protective Order With Modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/16/21. (dlg) Modified on 6/17/2021 to withdraw entry, corrected order to follow (dlg).
June 11, 2021 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidentiality by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
June 3, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janet Satterthwaite in Further Support of Ocean Spray's Motion to Stay)(Miller, Marci) (dlg).
May 28, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Levine)(Levine, Andrew) (dlg).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying #25 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/26/21. (dlg)
May 19, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Supplemental) filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Snyder, John) (dlg).
May 19, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Julia Anne Matheson by Julia Anne Matheson on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Matheson, Julia)Attorney Julia Anne Matheson added to party Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.(pty:dft)
May 19, 2021 Filing 25 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew Levine, #3 Declaration of Nathaniel Noone)(Levine, Andrew) (dlg).
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Corrected Filing by Wedge Water LLC (Levine, Andrew)
May 12, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) re #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief 15 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief Opposition filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Janet Satterthwaite in Support of Ocean Spray's Opposition to Wedge Water's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery, #2 Declaration of Kevin Penwell In Opposition to Application for Expedited Discovery)(Matheson, Julia)
May 12, 2021 Filing 22 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 24 *** Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) re #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Levine, Andrew) Modified on 5/20/2021 (dlg).
May 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Corrected Filing by Wedge Water LLC re #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Levine, Andrew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Wedge Water LLC re #15 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Levine, Andrew) QC email re Errata. Attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg).
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Wedge Water LLC of case(s) 1:21-cv-10669 . (Levine, Andrew) (dlg).
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Janet F. Satterthwaite, re #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/11/2021.(rmc)
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wedge Water LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3 Fold LLC for Wedge Water LLC.. (Levine, Andrew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 Exhibit List to Declaration of Andrew Levine in Support of Plaintiff Wedge Water LLC d/b/a Wave Soda's Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Wedge Water LLC. (Levine, Andrew) (dlg).
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 21 *** Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Discovery in Support of Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew Levine, #3 Declaration of Nathaniel Noone)(Levine, Andrew) (dlg). Modified on 5/13/2021 (dlg).
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Wedge Water's Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. of case(s) 1:21-cv-10669 , Massachusetts U.S. District Court (Ocean Spray v. Wedge Water). (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15701982.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Satterthwaite, Janet) (rmc).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of John Roger Snyder, re #10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/6/2021.(rmc)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15694693.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Snyder, John) (rmc).
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Julia Anne Matheson by Marci Lerner Miller on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci) QC email, incorrect filer, attorney should withdraw and refile correctly (dlg).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Stay : Responses due by 5/28/2021, Replies due by 6/14/2021. A hearing is set on July 9, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/4/21.(dlg)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Miller, Marci) (dlg).
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Declaration Declaration of Janet Satterthwaite)(Miller, Marci) (dlg). Modified on 5/18/2021 to send qc email for courtesy copies (dlg)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Marci Lerner Miller by Marci Lerner Miller on behalf of Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. (Miller, Marci)Attorney Marci Lerner Miller added to party Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda) (jms).
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *5571632*, *88850989*, *4641901* cc:USPTO (zda) (jms).
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BCASDC-15655472.), filed by Wedge Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-809-GPC-BLM. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Levine, Andrew)(zda)(jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wedge Water LLC v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wedge Water, LLC doing business as Wave Soda
Represented By: Andrew Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.
Represented By: Janet F. Satterthwaite
Represented By: John Roger Snyder
Represented By: Julia Anne Matheson
Represented By: Marci Lerner Miller
Represented By: John R. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?