Cohen et al v. Solar Therapeutics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sacha Baron Cohen and Please You Can Touch, LLC
Defendant: Solar Therapeutics INC. and Edward Dow, III
Case Number: 1:2021cv11139
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Russell A. Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Please You Can Touch, LLC. (Condon, David)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Russell A. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8865646 by Sacha Baron Cohen, Please You Can Touch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Condon, David)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sacha Baron Cohen, Please You Can Touch, LLC. Edward Dow, III waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Condon, David)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sacha Baron Cohen, Please You Can Touch, LLC. Solar Therapeutics INC. waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Condon, David)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of copyright case . (Condon, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford N. Louison on behalf of Sacha Baron Cohen, Please You Can Touch, LLC (Louison, Bradford)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination re: Copyright - AO 121. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of copyright case (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8854820 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sacha Baron Cohen, PLEASE YOU CAN TOUCH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Condon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. Solar Therapeutics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacha Baron Cohen
Represented By: Bradford N. Louison
Represented By: David E. Condon
Represented By: Russell A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Please You Can Touch, LLC
Represented By: Bradford N. Louison
Represented By: David E. Condon
Represented By: Russell A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Therapeutics INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Dow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?