Ferri v. ACE American Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: J Boone Ferri
Counter Claimant: ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11144
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Joint. (Smith, David)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/9/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by J Boone Ferri.(Greeley, Christopher)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF FERRI'S ANSWER to Counterclaim of the DEFENDANT ACE AMERICAN by J Boone Ferri.(Greeley, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record ACE American Insurance Company summons served on 6/19/2021, answer due 7/12/2021.. (Smith, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against J Boone Ferri by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Policy)(Smith, David)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Greeley on behalf of J Boone Ferri (Greeley, Christopher)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Black on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company (Black, James)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACE American Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8856057 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 JS45 Category Form)(Smith, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferri v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: J Boone Ferri
Represented By: Owen P. McGowan
Represented By: Christopher J. Greeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: David S. Smith
Represented By: James Andrew Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?