Great Lakes Insurance SE v. 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association et al
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Defendant: 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association, Trustees of 436 Ashmont Street Condominium Trust and Michael Nee
Case Number: 1:2021cv11149
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Murphy on behalf of Trustees of 436 Ashmont Street Condominium Trust (Murphy, Paul)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association.(Murphy, Paul)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendant Michael Nee having filed an Answer and the remaining defendants due to respond to the Complaint by August 24, 2021, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 9/20/21; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties must be filed by 11/29/21. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions, and 30 document requests, to be served within the 30 days of initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If all parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 1/28/22 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 3/25/22. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/22/22, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 5/13/22; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 1/21/22, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule. (Zierk, Marsha)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman F. Orban, III on behalf of Michael Nee (Orban, Norman)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Nee.(Orban, Norman)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Process filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. Individual(s)/Entities served: Michael Nee. (Flanagan, Christopher)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Nee served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Flanagan, Christopher)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Service of Process filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. Individual(s)/Entities served: Trustees of 436 Ashmont Street Condominium Trust. (Flanagan, Christopher)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Trustees of 436 Ashmont Street Condominium Trust served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Flanagan, Christopher)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Service of Process filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. Individual(s)/Entities served: 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association. (Flanagan, Christopher)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Flanagan, Christopher)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Lakes Insurance SE identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance Company for Great Lakes Insurance SE.. (Flanagan, Christopher)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association, Michael Nee, Trustees of 436 Ashmont Street Condominium Trust. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8856837 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Flanagan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Insurance SE v. 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance SE
Represented By: Christopher P. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 436 Ashmont Street Condo Association
Represented By: Paul F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of 436 Ashmont Street Condominium Trust
Represented By: Paul F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nee
Represented By: Norman F. Orban, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?