Ocean Apex T&B LLC et al v. Unknown Claimant(s)
Petitioner: Ocean Apex T&B LLC and POLING & CUTLER MARINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Claimant: unknown claimants and Mark DeSousa
Case Number: 1:2021cv11155
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
July 14, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-00120.
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 1. Claimant Mark DeSousa's Motion to Transfer Venue #20 is GRANTED. 2. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Eastern Division, for all further proceedings, in accordance with Rule F(9) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. 3. The Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this action immediately to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Eastern Division, and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/13/2021. (GLP)
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE by Ocean Apex T&B LLC, Poling & Cutler Marine Transportation, LLC re #20 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case Notice of No Opposition to Claimant Mark DeSousa's Motion to Transfer Venue (Llamas, Luis)
July 1, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Mark DeSousa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Weber, Marnix)
May 24, 2021 Filing 19 CLAIM and demand for trial by jury by Mark DeSousa. (AG)
May 24, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Mark DeSousa.(AG)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 potential claimant Mark DeSousa's Unopposed Motion for Michael B. Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 potential claimant Mark DeSousa's Unopposed Motion for Marnix E. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/19/2021. (DMS)
May 18, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael B. Flynn (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063942.) Related document: #15 MOTION for Michael B. Flynn to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 18, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Marnix E. Weber (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063943.) Related document: #16 MOTION for Marnix E. Weber to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Marnix E. Weber to appear pro hac vice by Mark DeSousa. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Special Admission Fee)(AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Michael B. Flynn to appear pro hac vice by Mark DeSousa. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Special Admission Fee)(AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Monition Period through May 24, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/10/2021. (DMS)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Extension of Monition Period by Ocean Apex T&B LLC, Poling & Cutler Marine Transportation, LLC. (Llamas, Luis)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases listed in Rule 3.02(d). These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change in Local Rules. (BGS)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Signed by Deputy Clerk on January 19, 2021. (DMS)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Petitioners' Motion for Approval of Security, Restraining Order, Dissolution of Warrants for Arrest, Notice to Claimants and Other Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/19/2021. (DMS)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/15/2021. (BGS)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/15/2021. (BGS)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Jefferson Tillery, Marc Herbert, C. Barrett Rice, and Jeanne Amy of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Luis Llamas of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-0120-T-36TGW. (SJB)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Approval of Security; MOTION for Restraining Order; MOTION for Dissolution of Warrants for Arrest, Notice to Claimants and Other Relief by Poling & Cutler Marine Transportation, LLC, The Complaint of Ocean Apex T&B LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Value, #2 Exhibit B-Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #3 Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2021 (JLD). Modified text on 1/15/2021 (AG).
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Claimant(s) (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17771215) filed by The Complaint of Ocean Apex T&B LLC, Poling & Cutler Marine Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2021 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocean Apex T&B LLC et al v. Unknown Claimant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ocean Apex T&B LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Shaw
Represented By: C. Barrett Rice
Represented By: Jeanne L. Amy
Represented By: Jefferson R. Tillery
Represented By: Luis E. Llamas
Represented By: Marc C. Herbert
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Represented By: Kristin E. Poling
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: POLING & CUTLER MARINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Shaw
Represented By: C. Barrett Rice
Represented By: Jeanne L. Amy
Represented By: Jefferson R. Tillery
Represented By: Luis E. Llamas
Represented By: Marc C. Herbert
Represented By: James E. Mercante
Represented By: Kristin E. Poling
Represented By: Robert J. Murphy
Represented By: Samuel P. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: unknown claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mark DeSousa
Represented By: Marnix E. Weber
Represented By: Michael B. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?