Falls Lake National Insurance Company v. Northfield Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Falls Lake National Insurance Company
Defendant: Northfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11174
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2021 03:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Maselek, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Northfield Insurance Company.(Maselek, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northfield Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Northland Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Northfield Insurance Company.. (Maselek, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Maselek, Jr on behalf of Northfield Insurance Company (Maselek, Robert)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northfield Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8864093 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(McDonough, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falls Lake National Insurance Company v. Northfield Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falls Lake National Insurance Company
Represented By: William P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P. McDonough
Represented By: Robert J. Maselek, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?