Walsh v. PS Tree Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: PS Tree Service, Inc. and Ronan A. De Souza
Case Number: 1:2021cv11179
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 10/28/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Deadlines Set Forth in Local Rule 16.1 (Lima, Christine)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Deadlines Set Forth in Local Rule 16.1 by Martin J. Walsh.(Wilkinson, Emily)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER entered. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 6, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A (Notice of Employee Rights))(Pedulla, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Flanagan, Jr on behalf of Ronan A. De Souza, PS Tree Service, Inc. (Flanagan, Thomas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/9/2021. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Martin J. Walsh re 5 Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 7 Order on Motion for TRO, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Notice of Appearance . (Wilkinson, Emily)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. Ronan A. De Souza waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Wilkinson, Emily)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Martin J. Walsh. PS Tree Service, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Wilkinson, Emily)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #2 Motion for TRO only. A hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction will be scheduled once Defendants have received notice of this action. (Lima, Christine)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ronan A. De Souza, PS Tree Service, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pedulla on behalf of Martin J. Walsh (Pedulla, Mark)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Wilkinson, Emily)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Marcelo M. Bini), #2 Exhibit B (Notice to Current and Former Employees), #3 Proposed Order)(Wilkinson, Emily). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 7/21/2021 (Lima, Christine).
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Form)(Wilkinson, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. PS Tree Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Emily Wilkinson
Represented By: Mark A. Pedulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PS Tree Service, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Flanagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronan A. De Souza
Represented By: Thomas J. Flanagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?