Ciolino v. Keystone Shipping Co. et al
Plaintiff: Riccardo G. Ciolino
Defendant: Keystone Shipping Co., Keystone Management Services, Inc., Chesapeake Shipping, Inc., Chilbar Shipping, Inc., Margate Shipping Company and Keystates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11246
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Keystone Shipping Co., Keystone Management Services, Inc., Keystates, Inc., Chilbar Shipping, Inc., and Margate Shipping Company to Answer Complaint. Defendants' answers due October 15, 2021. (Ferguson, Kerry)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Keystates, Inc. served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Anderson, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Keystone Management Services, Inc. served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. (Anderson, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Keystone Shipping Co. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Anderson, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chesapeake Shipping, Inc. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Anderson, David)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/2021 to File Answer to Complaint by Keystone Shipping Co..(Muldowney, Sean)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Margate Shipping Company served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Anderson, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chilbar Shipping, Inc. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Anderson, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
August 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn M. Latti on behalf of Riccardo G. Ciolino (Latti, Carolyn)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: Seaman), filed by Riccardo G. Ciolino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Catagory Form, #3 Seaman's Declaration)(Anderson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciolino v. Keystone Shipping Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riccardo G. Ciolino
Represented By: David F. Anderson
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Shipping Co.
Represented By: Sean Matthew Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Shipping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilbar Shipping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margate Shipping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?