LePorin v. Parzych et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J LePorin
Defendant: Greg S Parzych and Melissa Parzych
Case Number: 1:2021cv11249
Filed: August 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Melissa Parzych.(Goldman, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Greg S Parzych.(Goldman, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Greg S Parzych served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Latti, Carolyn)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Melissa Parzych served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (Latti, Carolyn) Modified on 9/2/2021 (Lima, Christine).
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Anderson on behalf of Daniel J LePorin (Anderson, David)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY against Melissa Parzych, Greg S Parzych Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8882915 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Daniel J LePorin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Latti, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LePorin v. Parzych et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J LePorin
Represented By: Carolyn M. Latti
Represented By: David F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg S Parzych
Represented By: Michael I. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Parzych
Represented By: Michael I. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?