Allison v. Philips North America LLC
Plaintiff: Susan Allison
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Holding USA, Inc. and Philips RS North America LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11265
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Savrin, Daniel)
September 7, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Susan Allison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McLoughlin, Ian)
September 7, 2021 Filing 25 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Susan Allison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLoughlin, Ian)
August 27, 2021 Filing 23 Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Savrin, Daniel)
August 27, 2021 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Responses due by 8/27/2021 (Hourihan, Lisa)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 27, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Philips RS North America LLC.(Rowley, Samuel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Susan Allison. (Haber, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philips North America LLC served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Haber, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philips RS North America LLC served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Haber, Edward)
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Expedite filed by Philips RS North America LLC. (Savrin, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Savrin, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC.(Savrin, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap, Corporate Parent Philips Holdings USA Inc. for Philips North America LLC; Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap, Corporate Parent Philips RS North America Holding Corporation for Philips RS North America LLC.. (Savrin, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Hall on behalf of Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC (Hall, Emma)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Savrin on behalf of Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC (Savrin, Daniel)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Susan Allison by Susan Allison. (Haber, Edward)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite by Susan Allison.(Haber, Edward)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Patrick Vallely by Susan Allison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Haber, Edward)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Susan Allison. (Haber, Edward)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Susan Allison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haber, Edward)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian J. McLoughlin on behalf of Susan Allison (McLoughlin, Ian)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Vallely on behalf of Susan Allison (Vallely, Patrick)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Stewart on behalf of Susan Allison (Stewart, Adam)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Holding USA, Inc., Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8886950 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susan Allison. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haber, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison v. Philips North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Allison
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Adam M. Stewart
Represented By: Ian J. McLoughlin
Represented By: Patrick J. Vallely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Holding USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC
Represented By: Daniel S. Savrin
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Represented By: Samuel R. Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?