United Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL SERVICES
Plaintiff: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: American Residential Services doing business as ARS/Rescue Rooter of Boston
Case Number: 1:2021cv11268
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Residential Services.(Taveras, Angel)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. American Residential Services answer due 9/30/2021. (PBS, law2)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/30/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by American Residential Services.(Taveras, Angel)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel Taveras on behalf of American Residential Services (Taveras, Angel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed American Residential Services served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Loftus, Patrick)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark Opalisky. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark Opalisky Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8894235 by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit)(Loftus, Patrick)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp, Inc. for United Property & Casualty Insurance Company.. (Loftus, Patrick)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Residential Services. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL SERVICES d/b/a ARS/RESCUE ROOTER OF BOSTON Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8887721 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by United Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loftus, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick J. Loftus, III
Represented By: Mark E. Opalisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Residential Services doing business as ARS/Rescue Rooter of Boston
Represented By: Angel Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?