McCusker v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Randy A McCusker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv11287
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint. U.S. Attorney General, District of Massachusetts served Delivered on 9/17/2021 (Warnock, Douglas)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint. Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region I Social Security Administration served Delivered on 9/17/2021 (Warnock, Douglas)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. Local Rule 4.1 and instructions for service by the United States Marshals Service attached. USM 285 form may be found at www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf and is also available from the Clerk upon request. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff re Service by USMS and Local Rule 4.1)(PSSA, 3)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue a summons. Plaintiff is responsible for serving the complaint and summons in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 90 days of the date the summons is issued. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the action without prior notice to Plaintiff. See L.R. 4.1. If so asked by Plaintiff, the United States Marshals Service shall complete service as directed by Plaintiff with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Plaintiff is responsible for providing the United States Marshals Service all papers for service and for completing a USM-285 form for each individual to be served. (PSSA, 3)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy A McCusker.(Daniele, Darlene) . Modified event type and docket text on 8/18/2021 (Warnock, Douglas). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/23/2021) (Lima, Christine).
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Randy A McCusker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daniele, Darlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCusker v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy A McCusker
Represented By: Darlene M. Daniele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?