Dor v. Moniz
Petitioner: Jonalson Dor
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2021cv11288
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Order of Dismissal. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). The court grants petitioner Jonalson Dor's request for a bond hearing regarding his detention in ICE custody and Orders the Boston Immigration Court hold a hearing within ten business days of this Order (consistent with the government's position, see Dkt #6). (Pacho, Arnold)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Antone Moniz of Intent Not to Oppose Bond Hearing (Sady, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Antone Moniz (Sady, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. 1.The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition on the Respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2.The Respondent shall, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, file an answer or other responsive pleading. Petitioner shall file a reply brief within 7 days of the filing of Respondent's brief. (PSSA, 4)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Torrey on behalf of Jonalson Dor (Torrey, Philip)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8892515 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Jonalson Dor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, Jonalson Dor, #2 Exhibit Reid Decision, #3 Exhibit First Circuit Docket, Petition for Review, #4 Exhibit Motion to Stay Removal, #5 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #6 Exhibit Criminal Dockets, #7 Exhibit April 19 2019 Transcript, #8 Exhibit May 1 2019 Transcript, #9 Exhibit May 8 2019 Transcript, #10 Exhibit May 15 2019 Transcript, #11 Exhibit May 29 2019 Transcript, #12 Exhibit June 10 2019 Transcript, #13 Exhibit August 19 2019 Transcript, #14 Exhibit First Part of October 23 2019 Transcript, #15 Exhibit Second Part of October 23 2019 Transcript, #16 Exhibit November 15 2019 Transcript, #17 Exhibit Custody Decision, #18 Exhibit Removal Decision, #19 Exhibit BIA Briefing Schedules, #20 Exhibit BIA Brief, #21 Exhibit BIA Decision, #22 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Jonalson Dor, #23 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form Jonalson Dor)(Crane, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dor v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonalson Dor
Represented By: Edward D. Crane
Represented By: Philip L. Torrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?