Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11301
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST086245 for monies received on 8/27/21 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: #11 Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings.. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/25/2021. Court GRANTED #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: L. Oliverio, D. Adams) (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST086190 for monies received on 8/25/21 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: (11 in 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ, 11 in 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ) Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings.. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ et al.(Barbosa, Nilsa)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ( Show Cause Hearing set for 8/25/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.)(Urso, Lisa)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for TRO (Urso, Lisa)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Prior Orders, #2 Exhibit B Other MA Orders, #3 Exhibit C Other Orders)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tour, #2 Exhibit B Official Goods)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100, XYZ Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. of Related Cases (Oliverio, Michael)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8898004 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Oliverio, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. v. Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?