Sanchez v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Diana Sanchez
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv11329
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Scheduling Conference held on 10/13/2021, ( Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2022), (Further Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.). (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Ferraro, Benton, White & Anderson) (Urso, Lisa)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Anderson on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Anderson, Shane)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Shane A. Anderson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shane A. Anderson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9003202 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Murphy, Susan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of call in # for tomorrow at 2:00 is 888-675-2535 access code 7065717 (Urso, Lisa)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Boston Scientific Corporation.(White, Lisa)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (by phone)(Urso, Lisa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan D. Murphy on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Murphy, Susan)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Boston Scientific Corporation.(White, Lisa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Oliver White on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (White, Lisa)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Scientific Corporation served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021 by Diana Sanchez. (Ferraro, Julie) Modified on 9/3/2021 to adjust docket text and event used (Currie, Haley).
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Danae N. Benton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Danae Benton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8911688 by Diana Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ferraro, Julie)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8906327 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Diana Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Ferraro, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Sanchez
Represented By: Julie S. Ferraro
Represented By: Danae N. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Shane Anderson
Represented By: Susan D. Murphy
Represented By: Lisa Oliver White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?