Skelton v. Care.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shelby Skelton
Defendant: Care.com, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2021cv11360
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 43 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Paine, Matthew)
September 15, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Settlement by Shelby Skelton (Friedman, Todd)
September 9, 2021 Filing 41 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Todd M. Friedman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd M. Friedman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8938172 by Shelby Skelton. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Muller, Chip)
September 8, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Chip Muller on behalf of Shelby Skelton (Muller, Chip)
September 3, 2021 Filing 38 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Jacob Sommer, James Orenstein, and Anna Hsia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Filing 37 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Joint Motion to Continue. Status Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support re #35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Renewed) filed by Care.com, Inc.. (Butts, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Renewed) by Care.com, Inc..(Butts, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anna Hsia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8930749 by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anna Hsia)(Butts, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James Orenstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8930746 by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Orenstein)(Butts, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jacob Sommer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8930738 by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jacob Sommer)(Butts, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam W. McCall on behalf of Care.com, Inc. (McCall, Adam)
September 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Butts on behalf of Care.com, Inc. (Butts, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 29 JOINT MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Care.com, Inc., Shelby Skelton.(Paine, Matthew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/7/2021 at 2:45 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 19, 2021 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 19, 2021 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02086.
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order: (1) Granting Defendant' Motion to Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative, Stay, or Dismiss the Complaint, (Doc. No. #12 ); and (2) Denying as Moot Without Prejudice Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration, (Doc. No. #11 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/17/2021. (jrm)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #12 MOTION to Change Venue or in the alternative, to stay or dismiss the complaint, #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. These motions are suitable for determination on the record and without need for oral argument, pursuant to CivLR 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and these motions are deemed submitted as of this date.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
February 4, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #22 Objection filed by Care.com, Inc.. (Hsia, Jui-Ting) (jrm).
January 29, 2021 Filing 22 OBJECTION by Shelby Skelton Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Additional Evidence and Statements Submitted With Its Reply. (Friedman, Todd) (jrm).
January 28, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Care.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chuck Burt, #2 Declaration of Anna Hsia)(Hsia, Jui-Ting) (jrm).
January 28, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue or in the alternative, to stay or dismiss the complaint filed by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna Hsia)(Hsia, Jui-Ting) (jrm).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 12.1. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 14 days after the Court issues a ruling on the motion to compel arbitration, motion to transfer venue, and motion to stay. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/25/2021. (jrm)
January 22, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Joint Motion)(Hsia, Jui-Ting) (jrm).
January 21, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Change Venue or in the alternative, to stay or dismiss the complaint filed by Shelby Skelton. (Friedman, Todd)(jrm).
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, Amended Declaration of Todd M. Friedman in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Shelby Skelton. (Friedman, Todd)(jrm).
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Order Compelling Arbitration filed by Shelby Skelton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Friedman, Todd)(jrm).
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint against Care.com, Inc., filed by Shelby Skelton. (Friedman, Todd) (jrm).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #12 MOTION to Change Venue or in the alternative, to stay or dismiss the complaint, #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Responses due by 1/21/2021; Replies due by 1/28/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue or in the alternative, to stay or dismiss the complaint by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities iso Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration of A. Hsia iso Motion to Transfer)(Hsia, Jui-Ting) (jrm).
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of C. Burt iso Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration of S. Marks iso Motion to Compel, #4 Declaration of A. Hsia iso Motion to Compel)(Hsia, Jui-Ting) (jrm).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Further Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 12.1. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from 12/23/2020 to 1/6/2021. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/21/2020. (jrm)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Joint Motion)(Hsia, Jui-Ting)(jrm).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Further Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 12.1. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from 12/9/2020 to 12/23/2020. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/4/2020. (jrm)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Joint Motion)(Hsia, Jui-Ting)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 12.1. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff' Complaint is extended from 11/25/2020 to 12/9/2020. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/23/2020. (jrm)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Care.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IAC/InterActive Corp for Care.com, Inc... (Hsia, Jui-Ting)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Care.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration iso Joint Motion)(Hsia, Jui-Ting)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jui-Ting Anna Hsia on behalf of Care.com, Inc. (Hsia, Jui-Ting)Attorney Jui-Ting Anna Hsia added to party Care.com, Inc.(pty:dft)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Care.com, Inc., Does 1 through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14740330.), filed by Shelby Skelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2086-AJB-DEB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Friedman, Todd)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skelton v. Care.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Skelton
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Chip Muller
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jui-Ting Anna Hsia
Represented By: Anna Hsia
Represented By: Jacob A. Sommer
Represented By: James Orenstein
Represented By: Adam W. McCall
Represented By: John J. Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?