Tufts University School of Medicine v. Evidence in Motion, LLC
Plaintiff: Tufts University School of Medicine
Defendant: Evidence in Motion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11373
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/9/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2022. Discovery to be completed by 6/30/2022 Status Report due by 3/4/2022(Quinn, Thomas)
November 30, 2021 Filing 19 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: the clerk gives notice of prohibition on broadcasting, photographing, or recording of the court proceeding; case called; Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2021; counsel report case type and scope of discovery required; USMJ Dein adopts the proposed discovery schedule, sets status conference for 3/9/22 at 10:00am. Counsel will notify deputy clerk Quinn if ADR is viable. (Court Reporter: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Lukey, Wolosz, Brooks Weiss, Swartz and Schumacher) (Quinn, Thomas)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING ***Time Change Only***This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Local Rule 16.1 Joint Statement. (Lukey, Joan)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Lukey, Joan)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Brooks, Douglas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel J. Weiss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Samantha N. Swartz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ashley M. Schumacher. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel J. Weiss Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9053296 by Evidence in Motion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Good Standing)(Brooks, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Samantha N. Swartz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9053286 by Evidence in Motion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Good Standing)(Brooks, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ashley M. Schumacher Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9053265 by Evidence in Motion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Good Standing)(Brooks, Douglas)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Evidence in Motion, LLC.(Brooks, Douglas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Tufts University School of Medicine.. (Lukey, Joan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Tufts University School of Medicine. Evidence in Motion, LLC served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Tufts University School of Medicine. (Wolosz, Justin)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Wolosz on behalf of Tufts University School of Medicine (Wolosz, Justin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Evidence in Motion, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
August 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electroni> Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evidence in Motion, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8913067 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Tufts University School of Medicine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Lukey, Joan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tufts University School of Medicine v. Evidence in Motion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tufts University School of Medicine
Represented By: Joan A. Lukey
Represented By: Justin J. Wolosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evidence in Motion, LLC
Represented By: Douglas S. Brooks
Represented By: Ashley M Schumacher
Represented By: Samantha N Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?