Andrews v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert Andrews
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11375
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 9/29/2021. Case file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO - 289 in MDL Case 2741 received from the Northern District of California requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 289 in MDL Case 2741 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Robert Andrews.(Latimer, Richard)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8913402 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Latimer, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Andrews
Represented By: Richard K. Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?