Alastin Skincare, Inc. v. Skincare Solutions Store, LLC
Plaintiff: Alastin Skincare, Inc.
Defendant: Skincare Solutions Store, LLC doing business as www.skincaresolution.com, AMAZON RESELLER "Advanced Skincare LLP" and EBAY RESELLER "loveyourskin-us,"
Case Number: 1:2021cv11386
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Tscheschke on behalf of Skincare Solutions Store, LLC (Tscheschke, David)
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction and Proper Venue by Skincare Solutions Store, LLC. The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 8) filed on September 17, 2021 is TERMINATED AS MOOT in light of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 14). (Dore, Samantha)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Skincare Solutions Store, LLC, filed by Alastin Skincare, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #8 Motion to Dismiss. ALLOWED. Opposition due by 10/15/2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction and Proper Venue by Alastin Skincare, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skincare Solutions Store, LLC. (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction and Proper Venue by Amie DiGiampaolo on behalf of Skincare Solutions Store, LLC filed by on behalf of Skincare Solutions Store, LLC. (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction and Proper Venue filed by Skincare Solutions Store, LLC. (DiGiampaolo, Amie)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Failure to Establish Personal Jurisdiction and Proper Venue by Skincare Solutions Store, LLC.(DiGiampaolo, Amie)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases Procedural ORDER entered. (Dore, Samantha)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J. Jacobs on behalf of Skincare Solutions Store, LLC (Jacobs, Travis)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. Skincare Solutions Store, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Brodsky, Jack)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Skincare Solutions Store, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING TRADEMARK. (Dore, Samantha)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skincare Solutions Store, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8917141 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Alastin Skincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Form AO120)(Nickerson, Morgan) Modified on 8/24/2021 (Dore, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alastin Skincare, Inc. v. Skincare Solutions Store, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alastin Skincare, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skincare Solutions Store, LLC doing business as www.skincaresolution.com, AMAZON RESELLER "Advanced Skincare LLP" and EBAY RESELLER "loveyourskin-us,"
Represented By: Amie DiGiampaolo
Represented By: David Tscheschke
Represented By: Travis J. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?