Nantucket Residents Against Turbines et al v. United States Bureau of Ocean Energy Management et al
Plaintiff: Nantucket Residents Against Turbines and Vallorie Oliver
Defendant: United States Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, National Marine Fisheries Service, Sec of the Interior Debra Haaland and Secretary of Commerc Gina Raimondo
Intervenor Defendant: Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11390
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
October 21, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
October 19, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Intervene by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Hubbard, David)
October 19, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Intervene filed by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Hubbard, David)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC identifying Corporate Parent Avangrid Renewables, LLC, Corporate Parent Copenhagen Infrastructure Partners, P/S for Vineyard Wind 1 LLC.. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack W. Pirozzolo on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Pirozzolo, Jack)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #11 MOTION to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #11 MOTION to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Intervene filed by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver Notice of Related Case (Hubbard, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Hubbard on behalf of Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver (Hubbard, David)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David P. Hubbard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David P. Hubbard Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8931111 by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver.(Brendemuehl, Steven)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver. (Brendemuehl, Steven)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines, Vallorie Oliver. (Brendemuehl, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet.(Burgos, Sandra)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER THE NATIONAL ENVIRONMENTAL POLICY ACT AND THE ENDANGERED SPECIES ACT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8918155 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nantucket Residents Against Turbines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brendemuehl, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nantucket Residents Against Turbines et al v. United States Bureau of Ocean Energy Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nantucket Residents Against Turbines
Represented By: Steven P. Brendemuehl
Represented By: David P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vallorie Oliver
Represented By: Steven P. Brendemuehl
Represented By: David P. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec of the Interior Debra Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Commerc Gina Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Represented By: Jack W. Pirozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?