Collette v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Walter Collette, Jr.
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11392
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - Counts I, IV, VII and VIII filed by Walter Collette, Jr. (Bita, John)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - Counts I, IV, VII and VIII filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Michienzie, Paul)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - Counts I, IV, VII and VIII by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Michienzie, Paul)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michienzie on behalf of Sig Sauer, Inc. (Michienzie, Paul)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Sig Sauer, Inc. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Bita, John)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sig Sauer, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Bita, III on behalf of Walter Collette, Jr (Bita, John)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sig Sauer, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8918252 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Walter Collette, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Bita, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collette v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Collette, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Bita, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Michienzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?