Polinsky et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Plaintiff: Richard Polinsky and Joanne Polinsky
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Case Number: 1:2021cv11395
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Case Management Conference set for September 28, 2021 is RESET to November 15, 2021 04:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani.Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Howmedica Osteonics Corp served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Ward, Navan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp, filed by Joanne Polinsky, Richard Polinsky.(Ward, Navan)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-9, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Polinsky, et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8918662 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joanne Polinsky, Richard Polinsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Navan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polinsky et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Polinsky
Represented By: Navan Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Polinsky
Represented By: Navan Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?