Ace American Insurance Company vs Crown Coffee Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o, F5 Networks Inc. and Ace American Insurance Company
Defendant: Crown Coffee Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11423
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crown Coffee Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Coffee Service, Inc. for Crown Coffee Service, Inc... (Roder, Mark)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crown Coffee Service, Inc..(Roder, Mark)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Crown Coffee Service, Inc. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Eisenhaure, Rachel)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael L. DeBona. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael L. DeBona Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8934451 by Ace American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael L. DeBona, Esq.)(Eisenhaure, Rachel)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Crown Coffee Service, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8925410 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Eisenhaure, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace American Insurance Company vs Crown Coffee Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o
Represented By: Rachel J. Eisenhaure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F5 Networks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael L. DeBona
Represented By: Rachel J. Eisenhaure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Coffee Service, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Roder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?