Packard v. Dunphy et al
Plaintiff: David A. Packard
Defendant: Hon. Sean M. Dunphy, Hon. John D. Casey, Pamela A Casey O'Brien, Will Fuller and Mark Pearson
Case Number: 1:2021cv11427
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark Pearson. (Maselek, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mark Pearson.(Maselek, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Will Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Magratten, Brooks) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/22/2021) (Dore, Samantha). Modified on 10/22/2021 Exhibit B replaced with redacted version provided by counsel. (Dore, Samantha).
October 20, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Will Fuller.(Magratten, Brooks)
October 15, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Service by David A. Packard. (Dore, Samantha)
October 4, 2021 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #21 REPLY to Response to 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mark Pearson. To the extent the plaintiff requested, in his opposition to defendant Equitable's motion to extend, entry of default judgment as to Equitable, Doc. No. 15 at 3-4, that request is DENIED. To the extent Equitable requested, in its reply to the plaintiff's opposition, that the Court award it fees for its submissions related to its extension request, Doc. No. 21 at 2, that request is also DENIED. (Dore, Samantha)
September 30, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mark Pearson. (Maselek, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 20 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Will Fuller. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Will Fuller.(Magratten, Brooks)
September 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Will Fuller (Magratten, Brooks)
September 29, 2021 Filing 17 Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/23/21 to File Response filed by David A. Packard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Dore, Samantha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases Procedural ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mark Pearson filed by David A. Packard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Dore, Samantha) Modified on 9/28/2021 (Dore, Samantha). Date filed was changed.
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/23/21 to File Response by John D. Casey, Pamela A Casey O'Brien, Sean M. Dunphy. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/23/21 to File Response by John D. Casey, Pamela A Casey O'Brien, Sean M. Dunphy.(Duron, Angelica)
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica L. Duron on behalf of John D. Casey, Pamela A Casey O'Brien, Sean M. Dunphy (Duron, Angelica)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mark Pearson. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mark Pearson served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Will Fuller served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pamela A Casey O'Brien served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John D. Casey served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sean M. Dunphy served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to October 22, 2021 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mark Pearson.(Maselek, Robert)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee/payment: $ 402, receipt number 1BST086252 for #1 Complaint (Castilla, Francis)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John D. Casey, Pamela A Casey O'Brien, Sean M. Dunphy, Will Fuller, Mark Pearson. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Pearson, Pamela A Casey O'Brien, John D. Casey, Sean M. Dunphy, Will Fuller, filed by David A Packard. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit) (Dore, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Packard v. Dunphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Sean M. Dunphy
Represented By: Angelica L. Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. John D. Casey
Represented By: Angelica L. Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A Casey O'Brien
Represented By: Angelica L. Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Fuller
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pearson
Represented By: Robert J. Maselek, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?