Saninocencio v. Welch et al
Plaintiff: Nellie Saninocencio
Defendant: Richard E. Welch, III, Pierce and Mandell, PC, Litchfield Cavo. LLP, Avery Dooley and Noone, LLP, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court and Litchfield Cavo, LLP
Case Number: 1:2021cv11455
Filed: September 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court answer due 11/19/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 19, 2021 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court.(Rose, Nicholas) Modified on 10/29/2021 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event (Paine, Matthew).
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION for Sanctions and Costs filed by Pierce and Mandell, PC. (Carroll, Peter)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Sanctions and Costs by Pierce and Mandell, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carroll, Peter)
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 First Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nellie Saninocencio. (Dolan, Gary)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #5 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 First MOTION for Summary Judgment : MOTIONS HEARING RESET FOR 12/16/2021 09:45 AM IN REMOTE PROCEEDING: Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris.This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RESET FOR 12/16/2021 09:30 AM IN REMOTE PROCEEDING: Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowed #10 Motion to Continue Dispositive Motions Hearing ; Allowed #12 Motion to Continue Dispositive Motions Hearing. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motions Hearing to December 15, 2021 by Pierce and Mandell, PC.(Carroll, Peter)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 Opposition re #4 First MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion to Stay and/or Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pierce and Mandell, PC. (Carroll, Peter)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motions Hearing scheduled for November 29, 2021 by Pierce and Mandell, PC.(Carroll, Peter)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint,] First MOTION for Summary Judgment : This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Worcester before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Pierce and Mandell, PC.(Carroll, Peter)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nellie Saninocencio, filed by Nellie Saninocencio. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Dolan, Gary)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint by Pierce and Mandell, PC. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Rule 7.1 Certification, #17 Pierce and Mandell, P.C. Disclosure Statement, #18 Litchfield Cavo, LLP Disclosure Statement, #19 Avery Dooley and Noone, LLP Disclosure Statement)(Carroll, Peter)
September 26, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nellie Saninocencio.(Dolan, Gary)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avery Dooley and Noone, LLP, Litchfield Cavo, LLP, Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court, Pierce and Mandell, PC, Richard E. Welch, III. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8932984 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nellie Saninocencio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Dolan, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saninocencio v. Welch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Saninocencio
Represented By: Gary R. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Welch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce and Mandell, PC
Represented By: Peter H. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litchfield Cavo. LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Dooley and Noone, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Supreme Judicial Court
Represented By: Nicholas W. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litchfield Cavo, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?