Lainez et al v. Matarazzo Brothers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nora Lainez, Silvia Nunez and Betsy Ramos
Defendant: Matarazzo Brothers, LLC and Anthony Aresco
Case Number: 1:2021cv11462
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Scheduling Conference to November 16, 2021 NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 03:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Nora Lainez, Betsy Ramos, Silvia Nunez. Acknowledgment filed by Nora Lainez, Betsy Ramos, Silvia Nunez. (Summers, Nicole)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Nora Lainez, Betsy Ramos, Silvia Nunez. Acknowledgment filed by Nora Lainez, Betsy Ramos, Silvia Nunez. (Summers, Nicole)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Scheduling Conference to November 16, 2021 by Nora Lainez, Silvia Nunez, Betsy Ramos. (Attachments: #1 Joint Memorandum of Reasons in Support of Joint Motion to Continue Case Scheduling Conference)(Summers, Nicole)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2021 03:10 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: #1 Template for Scheduling Order)This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: #https://https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.(McKillop, Matthew)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record Anthony Aresco summons served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021; Matarazzo Brothers, LLC summons served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021.. (Gil, Lindsey)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Anthony Aresco, Matarazzo Brothers, LLC.(Gil, Lindsey)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ellis Burke on behalf of Anthony Aresco, Matarazzo Brothers, LLC (Burke, Jennifer)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A. Gil on behalf of Anthony Aresco, Matarazzo Brothers, LLC (Gil, Lindsey)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Matarazzo Brothers, LLC. (Gil, Lindsey)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthony Aresco, Matarazzo Brothers, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8934564 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Gil, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lainez et al v. Matarazzo Brothers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Lainez
Represented By: Nicole A. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Nunez
Represented By: Nicole A. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Ramos
Represented By: Nicole A. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matarazzo Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Ellis Burke
Represented By: Lindsey A. Gil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Aresco
Represented By: Jennifer Ellis Burke
Represented By: Lindsey A. Gil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?