Burton et al v. HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Burton and Cathy Mellin-Burton
Defendant: HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., Surgi-Care, Inc. and HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. a New Jersey Corporation doing business as STRYKER ORTHOPAEDICS
Case Number: 1:2021cv11490
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Murphy, Ryan)
October 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 14, 2021 Filing 19 DUPLICATE ENTRY - PLEASE REFER TO ENTRY #15 . NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Chesney on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Chesney, Stephanie) Modified on 10/18/2021 (Kelly, Danielle).
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Gross on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Gross, Brian) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/14/2021) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 10/14/2021: Replaced document with corrected version from counsel (Kelly, Danielle).
October 8, 2021 Filing 17 COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants (Fee Status: Paid in a member case) Short form complaint is filed as related to MDL: 2768 and the member case number is 1:21-cv-11490, filed by Edwin Burton, Cathy Mellin-Burton.(Kelley, Walter)
October 8, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Surgi-Care, Inc.. (Chesney, Stephanie) (Main Document 16 replaced on 10/14/2021) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 10/14/2021: Replaced document with corrected version from counsel (Kelly, Danielle).
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Chesney on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Chesney, Stephanie) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/18/2021) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 10/18/2021: Replaced document with corrected version from counsel (Kelly, Danielle).
October 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Alison C. Casey (Casey, Alison)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of Edwin Burton, Cathy Mellin-Burton (Kelley, Walter)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson G. Apjohn on behalf of HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Apjohn, Nelson)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing: Case Management Conference set for September 28, 2021 is RESET to November 15, 2021 04:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani.Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)This hearing will be conducted by video conference. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Casey, Alison)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Master Long Form Complaint by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-9, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Consent Order for Consolidation of Removed Matter with LFIT V40 MDL. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:21-cv-11490-IT (Kelly, Danielle)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
September 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Burton, et al v. Howmedica Ostenics Corp. et al. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (Finn, Mary)
September 12, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.. (Casey, Alison)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8941061 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Casey, Alison).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton et al v. HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Burton
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Mellin-Burton
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgi-Care, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Ryan M. Murphy
Represented By: Stephanie M. Chesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. a New Jersey Corporation doing business as STRYKER ORTHOPAEDICS
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Represented By: Nelson G. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?