Petersen v. Koninkelijke Philips, N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Petersen
Defendant: Koninkelijke Philips, N.V., Philips North America LLC and PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11557
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 Case Electronically transferred to Western District of Pennyslvania pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 10/20/2021 Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11132-DJC et al.(Currie, Haley) (Currie, Haley).
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying as moot #10 Motion to Stay in light of the MDL transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania (Hourihan, Lisa)
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 Certified copy of MDL Initial Transfer Order in MDL Case 3014 received from Western District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11132-DJC et al.(Currie, Haley)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 3014 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11130-DJC et al.(Jones, Sherry)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 3014 filed by PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hall, Emma)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 3014 by PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Philips North America LLC.(Hall, Emma)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Philips North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA Inc, Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap for PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Philips North America LLC.. (Hall, Emma)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma D. Hall on behalf of PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Philips North America LLC (Hall, Emma)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steve W. Berman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Currie, Haley)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steve W. Berman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8975296 by Charles Petersen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steve W. Berman)(Brennan, Hannah)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Charles Petersen. Philips North America LLC served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Charles Petersen. (Brennan, Hannah)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Charles Petersen. PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Charles Petersen. (Brennan, Hannah)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-8965149 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Charles Petersen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Recall Notice), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Brennan, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen v. Koninkelijke Philips, N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Petersen
Represented By: Hannah W. Brennan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninkelijke Philips, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?