Control Point Associates, Inc. et al v. Santosuosso et al
Plaintiff: Control Point Associates, Inc., Gerry L. Holdright and Charles E. Lent
Defendant: Christopher Santosuosso, Sites & Structures Group, Inc., Christopher Santosuosso doing business as Mammoth Associates, Inc. and Sites & Structures Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11699
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #8 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Christopher Santosuosso, Sites & Structures Group, Inc. (MacDonald, Gail)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Control Point Associates, Inc., Gerry L. Holdright, Charles E. Lent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Notice of Default)(Snyder, John)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gerry L. Holdright, Control Point Associates, Inc., Charles E. Lent. Sites & Structures Group, Inc. served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Gerry L. Holdright; Control Point Associates, Inc.; Charles E. Lent. (Snyder, John)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Gerry L. Holdright, Control Point Associates, Inc., Charles E. Lent. Christopher Santosuosso served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Gerry L. Holdright; Control Point Associates, Inc.; Charles E. Lent. (Snyder, John)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, (corrected) by Control Point Associates, Inc., Gerry L. Holdright, Charles E. Lent. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Category Sheet)(Snyder, John) (Main Document 2 and Attachment 1 replaced on 10/19/2021 with corrected Civil and Category Sheets) (Finn, Mary). Modified on 10/19/2021 (Finn, Mary).
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9013632 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Gerry L. Holdright, Control Point Associates, Inc., Charles E. Lent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Snyder, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Control Point Associates, Inc. et al v. Santosuosso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Control Point Associates, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry L. Holdright
Represented By: John R. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Lent
Represented By: John R. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Santosuosso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sites & Structures Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Santosuosso doing business as Mammoth Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sites & Structures Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?