Truist Bank v. Pierrette et al
Plaintiff: Truist Bank
Defendant: Manica Pierrette and Christian Williams
Trustee: Ally Bank and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11730
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER of Trustee by Bank of America, N.A. (Dore, Samantha)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases General Procedural ORDER entered. (Dore, Samantha)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Manica Pierrette and Christian Williams answer due 12/21/2021. (Simeone, Maria)
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/1/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Manica Pierrette.(Hightower, John)
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Hightower on behalf of Manica Pierrette (Hightower, John)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Hightower on behalf of Christian Williams (Hightower, John)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Summons of the Trustee returned executed as to Ally Bank. (Dore, Samantha) Modified on 11/10/2021: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha).
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of America, N.A. served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Stark, Andrew)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ally Bank served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (Stark, Andrew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 Summons to Trustee Issued as to Bank of America, N.A.. (Simeone, Maria)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Summons to Trustee For Writ of Attachment Issued as to Ally Bank. (Simeone, Maria)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Allowed. re #6 APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment by Truist Bank(Simeone, Maria)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Christian Williams served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Stark, Andrew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Manica Pierrette served on 10/26/2021, answer due 11/16/2021. (Stark, Andrew)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of Attachment by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of a Writ of Attachment by Trustee Process, #2 Declaration of Joel P. Howle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of a Writ of Attachment, #3 Proposed Summons to Trustee for Writ of Attachment to Ally Bank, #4 Proposed Summons to Trustee for Writ of Attachment to Bank of America, N.A.)(Stark, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Truist Bank. Document received: Proposed Summons for Christian Williams. (Stark, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Truist Bank. Document received: Proposed Summons for Manica Pierrette. (Stark, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9023303 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Stark, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truist Bank v. Pierrette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truist Bank
Represented By: Andrew T. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manica Pierrette
Represented By: John J. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Williams
Represented By: John J. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?