Tobias v. Smith
Plaintiff: Theodore Tobias
Defendant: Frederick Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv11736
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Theodore Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 4 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 5 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 6 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 7 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 8 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 9 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit 10 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit 11 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit 12v to Proposed Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 13 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit 14 to Proposed Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit 15 to Proposed Amended Complaint)(McDonagh, Christina)
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 State Court Record, DECLARATION of Daniel D. Johnson by Frederick Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ,State Court Record)(Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 12/14/2021 to correct filing event used by attorney and docket text(McManus, Caetlin). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/15/2021) (McManus, Caetlin).
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Amend Caption filed by Frederick Smith. (Johnson, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Captions from Frederick Smith to Named Corporations by Theodore Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McManus, Caetlin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Frederick Smith. (Johnson, Daniel)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Frederick Smith.(Johnson, Daniel)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Frederick Smith. (Johnson, Daniel)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Currie, Haley)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Johnson on behalf of Frederick Smith (Johnson, Daniel)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederick Smith ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9025218 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Smith
Represented By: Daniel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?