Giannasca v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Giannasca, on behalf of himself and all others so similarly situated and Anthony Giannasca
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac Indx Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-AR33, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-AR33 Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated and Deutsche Bank National Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11741
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthony Giannasca. (Dion, Todd)
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deutsche Bank National Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Default, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Cure, #3 Exhibit C - Superior Court Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Memo of Law, #6 Exhibit F - Memo and Order, #7 Exhibit G - Appeal Court Docket, #8 Exhibit H - Right to Cure)(Manganaro, Kevin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Deutsche Bank National Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Anthony Giannasca. (Dion, Todd)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Manganaro, Kevin)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 1, 2021 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint ( #1 - Exhibit A). PHH Mortgage Corporation Answer due 12/1/2021; Deutsche Bank National Company Answer due 12/1/2021. (Warnock, Douglas)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 1, 2021 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Deutsche Bank National Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. McKelvey on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation (McKelvey, Maura)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac Indx Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-AR33, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-AR33 Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated. (Manganaro, Kevin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Manganaro, Kevin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac Indx Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-AR33, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-AR33 Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated, PHH Mortgage Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9026211 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Manganaro, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giannasca v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Giannasca, on behalf of himself and all others so similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Giannasca
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of the Indymac Indx Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-AR33, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-AR33 Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Company
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Represented By: Maura K. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?