Chehab v. Dover Speed, LLC
Plaintiff: Saadeddine Ali Chehab
Defendant: Dover Speed, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11766
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Aceto on behalf of Dover Speed, LLC (Aceto, Gregory)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Dover Speed, LLC. (Cole, Michael)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases Procedural ORDER entered. (Dore, Samantha)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Cole on behalf of Dover Speed, LLC (Cole, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dover Speed, LLC served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. (Korth, Sebastian)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dover Speed, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dover Speed, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9033996 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Saadeddine Ali Chehab. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Korth, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chehab v. Dover Speed, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saadeddine Ali Chehab
Represented By: Sebastian N. Korth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Speed, LLC
Represented By: Gregory J. Aceto
Represented By: Michael B. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?