Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Trustees of Boston University
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Defendant: Trustees of Boston University
Case Number: 1:2021cv11769
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Referring Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/20/2022 to File Answer. Trustees of Boston University answer due 1/20/2022. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/20/2022 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Internet Media Interactive Corp..(Haller, Timothy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Trustees of Boston University served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Haller, Timothy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV added. District Judge Angel Kelley no longer assigned to case. (adminn, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. I hereby recuse myself under 28 U.S.C. 455. The clerk shall have this case randomly reassigned to another district judge. (Lara, Miguel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Timothy J. Haller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Timothy J. Haller Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9041622 by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Timothy J. Haller in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Getz, Richard)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Trustees of Boston University. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Dore, Samantha)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trustees of Boston University Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9034405 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Form)(Getz, Richard) Modified on 10/29/2021: Changed document description and refiled the AO 120 form so it was it's entry.(Dore, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Trustees of Boston University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Represented By: Richard D. Getz
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of Boston University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?