Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc. v. Controlled Environment Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc.
Defendant: Controlled Environment Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11896
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Controlled Environment Systems, LLC.(Callanan, Christopher)
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Callanan on behalf of Controlled Environment Systems, LLC (Callanan, Christopher)
January 17, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Controlled Environment Systems, LLC. (Callanan, Christopher)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Controlled Environment Systems, LLC served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Cohn, Jason)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Camodeca on behalf of Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc. (Camodeca, Erica)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Erica Camodeca. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Erica Camodeca Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9072052 by Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc..(Cohn, Jason)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Controlled Environment Systems, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9067918 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Cohn, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc. v. Controlled Environment Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rizzo's Malabar Inn, Inc.
Represented By: Jason E. Cohn
Represented By: Erica Camodeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Controlled Environment Systems, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Callanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?