Clark et al v. Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith and Shelly Stack
Defendant: Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center and Does No. 1-20
Amicus Curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States, American Hospital Association and Association of American Medical Colleges
Case Number: 1:2022cv10068
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Filing 73 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT (Currie, Haley)
September 22, 2023 Filing 72 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Hearing re Fairness held on 9/22/2023. Court hears from counsel. No one appears to object. Geoffrey Brahmer supplements his letter submitted to the Court at D. #70 . D. #70 marked and admitted to the record. The Court grants #63 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Case Contribution Awards (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Alec J. Berin and Laurie Rubinow for the Plaintiffs. Sean K. McMahan for the Defendants.) (Currie, Haley)
September 20, 2023 Filing 71 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING. Fairness Hearing set for 9/22/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11 (In person only) before Judge Denise J. Casper. (This notice is to inform counsel of the change of courtroom and that the hearing will take place in person)(Hourihan, Lisa)
September 18, 2023 Filing 70 Letter from Geoffrey Brahmer re Fairness Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Currie, Haley) Modified on 9/18/2023 (Currie, Haley).
September 15, 2023 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Case Contribution Awards Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Related Applications; Response to Objection filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Alec J. Berin, #2 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Cornelia Vieira)(Berin, Alec)
September 7, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack (Notice of Filing of Independent Fiduciary Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Independent Fiduciary Report)(Berin, Alec ) Modified on 9/7/2023 to adjust filer (Currie, Haley).
August 21, 2023 Filing 67 Letter/request (non-motion) re Fair Hearing Statement from Geoffrey Brahmer. (Attachments: #1 Fair Hearing Statement, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 6)(McManus, Caetlin)
August 8, 2023 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #63 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Case Contribution Awards Declaration of Cornelia Vieira Concerning the Mailing of the Settlement Notice and Former Participant Claim Form filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Berin, Alec)
August 8, 2023 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #63 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Case Contribution Awards Declaration of Alec J. Berin and Exhibit A Thereto filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Berin, Alec)
August 8, 2023 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Case Contribution Awards filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Berin, Alec)
August 8, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Case Contribution Awards by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack.(Berin, Alec)
June 28, 2023 Filing 62 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. Case redrawn according to Local Rule 40.1(i)(1). (Danieli, Chris)
May 5, 2023 Filing 61 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF SETTLEMENT NOTICE, AUTHORIZING NOTICE TO THE CLASS AND SCHEDULING FAIRNESS HEARING...Fairness Hearing SCHEDULED for 9/22/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (In person with remote access provided).(Beatty, Barbara)
May 4, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Settlement (Amended) by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and Exhibits to Settlement Agreement, #2 Certificate of Service)(Berin, Alec)
April 24, 2023 Filing 59 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER withdrawing #36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss pursuant to the #57 Joint Stipulation Withdrawing Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss in Light of Settlement. (Beatty, Barbara)
April 24, 2023 Filing 58 Clerk's Notes for Motion Hearing held via Zoom before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court discusses the plan of allocation submitted in the #52 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Parties to finalize, revise and resubmit the proposed notice and orders per the instructions provided by the Court no later than 12:00 noon on 5/4/2023. Word versions of these documents also to be emailed to the Clerk in case the Court needs to make further refinements. (Court Reporter: Jessica Leonard at jessica.bewsee@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Berin, Roddy, McMahan, Engelman) (Beatty, Barbara)
April 21, 2023 Filing 57 STIPULATION re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Withdrawing Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss in Light of Settlement [Joint] by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center. (Engelman, Keri)
April 20, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE RESCHEDULING VENUE AND TIME OF MOTION HEARING:This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. To accommodate out of state counsel and to reduce costs, the Motion Hearing is RESCHEDULED until 4:00 p.m. on 4/24/2023 in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
April 18, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING - Hearing Motion #36 to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and #52 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT is SCHEDULED for 4/24/2023 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1 (In person only) before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
October 18, 2022 Filing 54 Declaration of Alec Berin in Support of #52 PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Berin Declaration: Settlement Agreement & Release)(McManus, Caetlin)
October 18, 2022 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re #52 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 18, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Berin, Alec) Modified on 10/19/2022. Supporting documents attached in error by attorney removed and entered separately on the docket (McManus, Caetlin).
October 18, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack Notice of Filing (Berin, Alec)
October 5, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gabrielle P. Kelerchian (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelerchian, Gabrielle)
September 15, 2022 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Berin, Alec)
July 27, 2022 Filing 48 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #46 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation for Ninety (90) Days, 10/25/2022. As represented in this motion, Counsel shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the mediation. (Beatty, Barbara)
July 26, 2022 Filing 47 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #45 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara)
July 21, 2022 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center.(Engelman, Keri)
July 7, 2022 Filing 45 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to #36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Sur-Reply)(Berin, Alec) Modified to correct filing event used by attorney and docket text on 7/8/2022 (McManus, Caetlin).
June 24, 2022 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12)(Engelman, Keri)
June 3, 2022 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Rubinow, Laurie)
May 24, 2022 Filing 42 AMICUS BRIEF filed by American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Chamber of Commerce of the United States . (Santos, Jaime)
May 24, 2022 Filing 41 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #40 Motion for the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Hospital Association and Association of American Medical Colleges to Participate as Amici Curiae. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 20, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Chamber of Commerce of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Brief of Amici Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Hospital Association, and Association of American Medical Colleges in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Santos, Jaime)
May 20, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Bock on behalf of American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Chamber of Commerce of the United States (Bock, Jordan)
May 20, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime A. Santos on behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges (Santos, Jaime)
May 13, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keri L. Engelman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Engelman, Keri)
May 13, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center.(Engelman, Keri)
May 11, 2022 Filing 35 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Joint MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule and Page Limits Applicable to Defendants' Responsive Pleading - 1) Defendants motion to dismiss is due by May 13, 2022, and its memorandum of law in support is limited to 25 pages, double-spaced; 2) Plaintiffs opposition is due by June 3, 2022, and its memorandum of law in support is limited to 25 pages, double-spaced; and, 3)Defendants will be permitted to file a reply brief to Plaintiffs opposition, limited to 10 pages, double-spaced. Defendants reply is due by June 24, 2022. Such reply brief shall not be redundant of the brief in support of the motion to dismiss and address only matters raised in plaintiffs' opposition which were not reasonably foreseeable when their initial brief in support of the motion to dismiss was filed. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 11, 2022 Filing 34 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark K. Gyandoh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 33 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Gabrielle P. Kelerchian. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 32 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Donald R. Reavey. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 31 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Laurie Rubinow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 30 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kolin C. Tang. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 29 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James E. Miller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 28 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James C. Shah. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 27 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anna K. DAgostino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 11, 2022 Filing 26 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alec J. Berin. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 10, 2022 Filing 25 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark K. Gyandoh Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314997 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark K. Gyandoh)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gabrielle P. Kelerchian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314979 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gabrielle P. Kelerchian)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Donald R. Reavey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314970 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald R. Reavey)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laurie Rubinow Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314959 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Laurie Rubinow)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kolin C. Tang Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314950 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kolin C. Tang)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James E. Miller Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314947 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James E. Miller)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James C. Shah Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314942 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James C. Shah)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anna K. D'Agostino Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314933 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anna K. D'Agostino)(Roddy, John)
May 10, 2022 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alec J. Berin Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9314921 by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Alec J. Berin)(Roddy, John)
May 6, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Modify the Briefing Schedule and Page Limits Applicable to Defendants' Responsive Pleading by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center.(Engelman, Keri)
April 7, 2022 Filing 15 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading until 5/13/2022. (Beatty, Barbara)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/13/2022 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center.(Engelman, Keri)
March 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew J McKenna on behalf of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center (McKenna, Mathew)
March 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah S. Davidson on behalf of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center (Davidson, Deborah)
March 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean K. McMahan on behalf of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center (McMahan, Sean)
March 8, 2022 Filing 10 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Deborah S. Davidson, Sean K. McMahan, and Mathew J. McKenna. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Deborah S. Davidson, Sean K. McMahan, Mathew J. McKenna Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number AMADC-9215477 by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Deborah S. Davidson, #2 Affidavit of Sean K. McMahan, #3 Affidavit of Mathew J. McKenna)(Engelman, Keri)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent Beth Israel Lahey Health, Inc. for Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center.. (Engelman, Keri)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keri L. Engelman on behalf of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center (Engelman, Keri)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center. The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Rubinow, Laurie)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trudy Clark. Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Rubinow, Laurie)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trudy Clark. The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Rubinow, Laurie)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Does No. 1-20, Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9142537 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Trudy Clark, Donna Nesmith, Jessica Smith, Shelly Stack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Roddy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark et al v. Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Clark
Represented By: John J. Roddy
Represented By: Alec J. Berin
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Nesmith
Represented By: John J. Roddy
Represented By: Alec J. Berin
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Smith
Represented By: John J. Roddy
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Represented By: Alec J. Berin
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Stack
Represented By: John J. Roddy
Represented By: Alec J. Berin
Represented By: Donald R. Reavey
Represented By: Gabrielle Kelerchian
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Kolin C. Tang
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Mark K. Gyandoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center
Represented By: Deborah S. Davidson
Represented By: Sean K. McMahan
Represented By: Keri L. Engelman
Represented By: Mathew J McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Directors of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center
Represented By: Deborah S. Davidson
Represented By: Sean K. McMahan
Represented By: Keri L. Engelman
Represented By: Mathew J McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pension Committee of Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center
Represented By: Deborah S. Davidson
Represented By: Sean K. McMahan
Represented By: Keri L. Engelman
Represented By: Mathew J McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does No. 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Represented By: Jaime A. Santos
Represented By: Jordan Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Jaime A. Santos
Represented By: Jordan Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Jaime A. Santos
Represented By: Jordan Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?