Ambrose v. Boston Globe Media Partners LLC
Plaintiff: David Ambrose
Defendant: Boston Globe Media Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv10195
Filed: February 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC will respond to the Complaint no later than April 29, 2022. While the court permits this additional 21-day extension, it is the last, the defendant having given no substantive basis to alter the period allotted by the federal civil rules to respond to a Complaint. The court would like to set a schedule in this matter and will do so once the Answer is filed or motion to dismiss is filed and resolved. (Zierk, Marsha)
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 29, 2022 to Respond to Complaint by Boston Globe Media Partners LLC.(Orenstein, James) Modified on 3/24/2022 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew).
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented-to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Joshua D. Arisohn, Philip L. Fraietta, and Christopher R. Reilly. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua D. Arisohn, Philip L. Fraietta and Christopher R. Reilly Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number AMADC-9205644 by David Ambrose. (Attachments: #1 Arisohn Certificate, #2 Fraietta Certificate, #3 Reilly Certificate)(Godkin, David)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Boston Globe Media Partners LLC served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (Godkin, David)
February 26, 2022 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Boston Globe Media Partners LLC's request to extend until April 8, 2022, its time to respond to Complaint. (Zierk, Marsha)
February 26, 2022 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Boston Globe Media Partners LLC's request to extend until April 8, 2022, its time to respond to Complaint. (Zierk, Marsha)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 8, 2022 to Respond to Complaint by Boston Globe Media Partners LLC.(Orenstein, James)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Globe Media Partners LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9171053 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Ambrose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Godkin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrose v. Boston Globe Media Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ambrose
Represented By: David S. Godkin
Represented By: Christopher R. Reilly
Represented By: Joshua D. Arisohn
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Globe Media Partners LLC
Represented By: James Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?