Fitzhugh v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10217
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 24 SET SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES AS #17 JOINT STATEMENT ADOPTED: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2022; Fact Discovery to be completed by 8/30/2022; Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/30/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 29, 2022 Filing 23 Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The Court DENIES Fitzhugh's emergency motion for preliminary injunction (Docket No. [5)] and VACATES the stay (Docket No. #7 ). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 22, 2022 Filing 22 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2022 by VIDEO re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh....ORDERED: Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 21 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 3/22/2022 - Joint Statement - ADOPTED. Parties are not ready to refer the matter to ADR at this time. See dkt #17 Joint Statement for all deadlines.(Court Reporter: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 22, 2022 Filing 20 Response by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to #19 Suggestion of Bankruptcy . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Seeley, Donald)
March 22, 2022 Filing 19 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Russell, Glenn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Lake, Hale)
March 18, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Seeley, Donald)
March 16, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE re: #15 Notice of Scheduling Conference. Parties shall file a Joint Statement on or before 3/18/2022 pursuant to L.R. 16.1(D). Scheduling Conference/Preliminary Injunction hearing will go forward as scheduled on 3/22/22 by Video. (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/22/2022 03:15 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. SarisThis hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 3, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Lake, Hale)
February 25, 2022 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Seeley, Donald)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lake, Hale)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Lake, Hale)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Service of Process filed by Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh. Individual(s)/Entities served: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee, et. al.. (Russell, Glenn)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/22/2022 03:00 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted BY VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered RE #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. "Defendant shall file any opposition by 2/25/22. The foreclosure IS STAYED until the court can review the merits of the preliminary injunction motion." (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Russell, Glenn)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh.(Russell, Glenn)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of Well Fargo Bank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the IMPAC CMB Trust Series 2005-3 (Seeley, Donald)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Hale Yazicioglu Lake on behalf of Well Fargo Bank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the IMPAC CMB Trust Series 2005-3 (Lake, Hale)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Well Fargo Bank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee for the IMPAC CMB Trust Series 2005-3 ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9178906 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Lake, Hale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzhugh v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn V. Fitzhugh
Represented By: Glenn F Russell, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn F. Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?