Richardson et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W Richardson and Susan P Richardson
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 1:2022cv10337
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Merritt, David)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 29, 2022 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 29, 2022 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Merritt, David)
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Merritt on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Merritt, David)
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 13, 2022 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Urso, Lisa)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record. (Swisher, Meredith)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 13, 2022 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Swisher, Meredith)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9208872 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swisher, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey W Richardson
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan P Richardson
Represented By: Todd S. Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: David W. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?