Dubois v. Alves
Petitioner: Paul Dubois
Respondent: Nelson V Alves
Case Number: 1:2022cv10362
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 5 Petitioner's Verified MOTION for the Respondent to Traverse the Petition by Paul Dubois. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Kelly, Danielle)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. 1.The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [Doc. No. 1] by mailing copies of the same to the Respondent AND the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Attention: Chief of the Appellate Division, Office of the Attorney General, One Ashburton Place, 18th Floor, Boston, MA 021081598. 2.It is further ordered that the Respondent shall file an answer (or other proper responsive pleading) within 21 days of the date of this Order. The answer (or other responsive pleading) must also include a statement notifying this Court of the existence of any victim or victims as defined by 18 USC 3771. 3.This Court further requests the Respondent, as part of the return, to file such documents which reflect on the issue as to whether Petitioner exhausted available state remedies with respect to the matters raised by the Petition. (PSSA, 4)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST089235 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), (Barbosa, Nilsa)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Paul Dubois. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Supplement 1, #3 Supplement 2, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubois v. Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Dubois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nelson V Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?