Maio et al v. TD Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Rose Maio and Michael Maio
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10578
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 16 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendant's #15 Second Assented to Motion to Extend is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleadings are due by July 11, 2022. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 26, 2022 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to July 11, 2022 to File a Response to the Complaint (Assented-To) by TD Bank, N.A..(Fegreus, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF BREEANA J. SOMERS by TD Bank, N.A.(Fegreus, Elizabeth) Modified docket text on 5/3/2022 (Pacho, Arnold).
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MICHAEL S. ZULLO by TD Bank, N.A. (Fegreus, Elizabeth) Modified docket text on 5/3/2022 (Pacho, Arnold).
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Michael Zullo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 2, 2022 Filing 11 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Breeana J. Somers. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Fegreus, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 27, 2022 to File a Response to the Complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 27, 2022 to File a Response to the Complaint by TD Bank, N.A..(Fegreus, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Breeana J. Somers Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9278273 by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Atty. Somers Affidavit in Support of Motion)(Fegreus, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael S. Zullo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9278269 by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Atty. Zullo's Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion)(Fegreus, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TD Bank, N.A.. (Fegreus, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Fegreus on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (Fegreus, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TD Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9278185 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Superior Court Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time for Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet D. Mass. Civil Action Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Category Form)(Fegreus, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maio et al v. TD Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Maio
Represented By: Benjamin T. Carroll
Represented By: Mark D. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Maio
Represented By: Benjamin T. Carroll
Represented By: Mark D. Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Fegreus
Represented By: Breeana J. Somers
Represented By: Michael S. Zullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?