Melendez Cruz v. Bristol Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Victor L Melendez Cruz
Defendant: Bristol Superior Court, C.P.C.S, Javier Rosa, Francis Eviera and Carmen Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2022cv10581
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at Ash Street Jail (PSSA, 4)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 Judge William G. Young: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), plaintiff is obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account until the statutory filing fee has been paid in full. If Melendez Cruz wishes to pursue this action, he must file an amended complaint by July 8, 2022. (PSSA, 4)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 Letter in Support of His Petition from Victor L. Melendez Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Paine, Matthew)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor L Melendez Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Victor L Melendez Cruz. (Attachments: #1 category form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez Cruz v. Bristol Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor L Melendez Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P.C.S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Eviera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?