Tobias v. Smith
Plaintiff: Theodore Tobias
Defendant: Frederick Smith
Case Number: 1:2022cv10609
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Theodore Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11)(de Oliveira, Flaviana)
May 19, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Daniel D. Johnson by Frederick Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Certified Copy Norfolk Superior with Transfer Papers)(Johnson, Daniel)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Theodore Tobias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(McDonagh, Christina)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT by Theodore Tobias. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Theodore Tobias by Theodore Tobias. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Theodore Tobias. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Frederick Smith. (Johnson, Daniel)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by Frederick Smith.(Johnson, Daniel)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Frederick Smith. (Johnson, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Johnson on behalf of Frederick Smith (Johnson, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederick Smith ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9287669 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover)(Johnson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tobias v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Tobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Smith
Represented By: Daniel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?