Webb et al v. Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC
Plaintiff: Alexsis Webb and Marsclette Charley
Defendant: Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv10797
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by H. Luke Mitcheson (Mitcheson, H.)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi A. Kassan on behalf of Marsclette Charley, Alexsis Webb (Kassan, Randi)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. While it is not this court's practice to permit extensions of the time periods prescribed by the federal civil procedural rules without good cause shown, the court will allow this initial request. Because of the length of the request, the court is not inclined to further extension. (Zierk, Marsha)
June 21, 2022 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 9, 2022 to Respond to Complaint by Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC.(O'Donnell, Jordan)
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. O'Donnell on behalf of Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC (O'Donnell, Jordan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9337465 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Marsclette Charley, Alexsis Webb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Summons to be Issued)(Mitcheson, H.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2022: #5 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb et al v. Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexsis Webb
Represented By: H. Luke Mitcheson
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsclette Charley
Represented By: H. Luke Mitcheson
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Injured Workers Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?