Doe No. 101 v. City of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 101
Defendant: City of Boston, Morgan Seto, Stanley Seto and Lorraine Seto
Case Number: 1:2022cv10917
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Filing 30 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #24 STIPULATION of Plts Proposal to Amend Complaint and Assented MOTION for Extension of Time by City of Boston re #29 Amended Complaint; City of Boston answer due 8/19/2022. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 28, 2022 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe No. 101.(Durso, Carmen)
July 15, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Elizabeth Tavella on behalf of Lorraine Seto, Stanley Seto (Tavella, Hannah)
July 15, 2022 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lorraine Seto, Stanley Seto.(Walton, Kenneth)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Walton on behalf of Lorraine Seto, Stanley Seto (Walton, Kenneth)
July 14, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Morgan Seto.(Milligan, Leonard) (Main Document 25 replaced on 7/19/2022) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
July 14, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Plts Proposal to Amend Complaint and Assented MOTION for Extension of Time by City of Boston. (Vaca, Mauricio) Modified event type on 7/14/2022 (Warnock, Douglas).
July 11, 2022 Filing 23 STATE COURT Record by All Defendants.. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 11, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 11, 2022 Filing 20 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Vaca, Mauricio)
July 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nieve Anjomi (Anjomi, Nieve)
July 8, 2022 Filing 18 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST090210 for #1 Notice of Removal (Phillips, Sophie)
July 5, 2022 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to July 15, 2022 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; and #16 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to July 15, 2022 to File Answer. Stanley Seto, Lorraine Seto and Morgan Seto answer due 7/15/2022. (York, Steve)
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2022 to File Answer by Morgan Seto.(Milligan, Leonard)
July 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard E. Milligan, III on behalf of Morgan Seto (Milligan, Leonard)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 15, 2022 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lorraine Seto, Morgan Seto.(Walton, Kenneth)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/15/2022 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint (JCB, law1)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/15/2022 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Boston.(Vaca, Mauricio)
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mauricio J. Vaca on behalf of City of Boston (Vaca, Mauricio)
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lorraine Seto served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Durso, Carmen)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stanley Seto served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Durso, Carmen)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Morgan Seto served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Durso, Carmen)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Boston served on 6/10/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Durso, Carmen)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Dore, Samantha)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris) Modified on 6/16/2022 to add Magistrate Judge Assignment text (Danieli, Chris).
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 Category Form (JS44) by City of Boston. (Anjomi, Nieve) Modified on 6/13/2022: Updated document description. (Dore, Samantha).
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by City of Boston. (Anjomi, Nieve) Modified on 6/13/2022: Updated document description. (Dore, Samantha).
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form and Civil Cover sheet. The forms can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Dore, Samantha)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Boston ( Fee Status: Local Government) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Anjomi, Nieve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe No. 101 v. City of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 101
Represented By: Carmen L. Durso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boston
Represented By: Nieve Anjomi
Represented By: Mauricio J. Vaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Seto
Represented By: Leonard E. Milligan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Seto
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Tavella
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Seto
Represented By: Hannah Elizabeth Tavella
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?